Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gabriel Diaz Cueva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Azogues, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1925Born
15 Oct 195025.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 196438.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
13 Jan 196438.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
3 Mar 196438.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
196741.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
26 Jun 196843.0AppointedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
29 Apr 197549.8ResignedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
29 Apr 197549.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
18 Dec 199974.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Jan 201892.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Azogues, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Gabriel Diaz Cueva
Bishop José Gabriel Diaz Cueva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Azogues

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca, Archdiocese of Cuenca
Death PlaceCuenca, Archdiocese of Cuenca

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 53.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: CB, 27 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast