Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Machado, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1850BornCuenca
16 Nov 190757.3AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
16 Feb 190857.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
28 Apr 191665.7AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
22 Jan 192675.4DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Andrés Machado:
Bishop Andrés Machado S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 320
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013