Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo José Harris y Morales

Deceased

Bishop of Loja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1871BornCuenca
19 Jul 189625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
7 May 192049.0AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
17 Oct 192049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
10 Feb 194472.8DiedBishop of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Guillermo José Harris y Morales:
Bishop Guillermo José Harris y Morales (born , died ) Bishop of Loja

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013