Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Manuel Maldonado Barreno, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

Titular Bishop of Ceramussa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1927 BornAlausi
29 Jun 195326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 199062.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
2 Feb 199062.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramussa
3 Mar 199063.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramussa
4 Oct 200376.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Victor Manuel Maldonado Barreno:
Bishop Victor Manuel Maldonado Barreno O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guayaquil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,857
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015