Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Auguste Dartois, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dahomey

Titular Bishop of Temnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1861BornWez-Macquart, La Chapelle d’Armentières, France
3 Jul 188827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
27 May 190140.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dahomey, Benin
27 May 190140.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
25 Jul 190140.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
3 Apr 190543.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Dahomey, Benin

MicroData Summary for Louis-Auguste Dartois:
Bishop Louis-Auguste Dartois S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dahomey

  • a priest for 16.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 540
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014