Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe Adimou

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1916Born
14 Jan 195135.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 196852.1AppointedBishop of Lokossa, Benin
25 Jul 196852.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lokossa, Benin
28 Jun 197155.4AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
27 Dec 199074.9RetiredArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
8 Jul 199882.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Christophe Adimou
Archbishop Christophe Adimou (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCana
Ordained BishopOuidak

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast