Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidore de Souza

Deceased

Archbishop of Cotonou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1934BornOuidah
8 Jul 196228.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cotonou, Benin
17 Jul 198147.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cotonou, Benin
8 Dec 198147.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Cotonou, Benin
27 Dec 199056.7SucceededArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
13 Mar 199964.9DiedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Isidore de Souza:
Archbishop Isidore de Souza (born , died ) Archbishop of Cotonou

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013