Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Cyrille Houndékon

Bishop of Abomey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1960 BornCotonou
2 Feb 198626.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cotonou, Benin
5 Jul 198626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cotonou, Benin
20 Dec 200747.9AppointedBishop of Abomey, Benin
3 Feb 200848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Abomey, Benin

MicroData Summary for Eugène Cyrille Houndékon:
Bishop Eugène Cyrille Houndékon (born ) Bishop of Abomey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abomey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,672
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013