Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy Adoukonou

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Titular Bishop of Zama Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1942 Born
16 Dec 196624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Abomey, Benin
3 Dec 200967.2AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Culture
10 Sep 201169.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
8 Oct 201169.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
24 Aug 201775.0RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Culture

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy Adoukonou (VIAF: 51684595)
Bishop Barthélemy Adoukonou (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Culture

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbomey, Diocese of Abomey, Benin
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Culture.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Sep 2011
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Sep 2011
  • c34: CB, 17 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,175
  • r: CB, 23 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017