Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nestor Assogba

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1929Born
21 Dec 195728.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 197647.1AppointedBishop of Parakou, Benin
25 Jul 197647.4Ordained BishopBishop of Parakou, Benin
16 Oct 199768.6AppointedArchbishop of Parakou, Benin
29 Oct 199970.6AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
5 Mar 200576.0RetiredArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
22 Aug 201788.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Nestor Assogba
Archbishop Nestor Assogba (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbomey
Death PlaceBohicon, Diocese of Abomey

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Aug 2017