Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Luis Zordán, M.SS.CC.

Bishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1956 Born
17 Mar 198427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
28 Mar 201760.3AppointedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
28 May 201760.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Héctor Luis Zordán
Bishop Héctor Luis Zordán M.SS.CC. (born ) Bishop of Gualeguaychú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalchaquí, Diocese of Reconquista
Ordained BishopSan José, Cathedral, Gualeguaychú, Diocese of Gualeguaychú

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gualeguaychú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 4 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 5 Apr 2017
  • c34: CB, 28 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017