Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregor von Zirkel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Hippos

Titular See: (died before papal confirmation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1762BornSylbach
18 Dec 178422.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
23 Sep 178624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
20 Sep 180240.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
20 Sep 180240.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
28 Oct 180240.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
25 Oct 181755.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
18 Dec 181755.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Gregor von Zirkel:
Bishop Gregor von Zirkel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 67
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015