Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Barbosa dos Santos, C.M.

Prelate of Tefé, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1967 BornSertânia
11 Feb 199527.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Jan 199628.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
14 May 201447.2AppointedPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
28 Aug 201447.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
21 Sep 201447.5InstalledPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Barbosa dos Santos:
Bishop Fernando Barbosa dos Santos C.M. (born ) Prelate of Tefé

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Tefé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014