Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Carlos Petrini

Bishop of Camaçari, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1945 Born
14 Sep 197428.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fermo, Italy
28 Jun 197529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fermo, Italy
12 Jan 200559.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Jan 200559.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
10 Mar 200559.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
15 Dec 201065.0AppointedBishop of Camaçari, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Carlos Petrini
Bishop João Carlos Petrini (born ) Bishop of Camaçari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermo, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Camaçari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,831
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast