Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amilcare Pasini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1917BornGainago
16 Jun 194022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
31 Dec 196548.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
31 Dec 196548.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
14 Jan 196648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
5 Aug 197153.8AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
30 Nov 198164.1ResignedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
24 May 199577.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Amilcare Pasini:
Bishop Amilcare Pasini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo)

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013