Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Moon Chang-woo

Bishop of Cheju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1963 Born
10 Feb 199632.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cheju, Korea (South)
28 Jun 201754.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
15 Aug 201754.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
22 Nov 202057.6SucceededBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Pius Moon Chang-woo
Bishop Pius Moon Chang-woo (born ) Bishop of Cheju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCheju, Diocese of Cheju
Ordained BishopOutside at St. Isidore Retreat Center, Cheju, Diocese of Cheju

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cheju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Jul 2017
  • c34: CB, 15 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,497
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast