Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Jozef Maria Wiertz

Bishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1942 Born
30 Mar 196825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
10 Jul 199350.6AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
25 Sep 199350.8Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
2 Dec 201775.0RetiredBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Jozef Maria Wiertz (VIAF: 283927807)
Bishop Franciscus Jozef Maria Wiertz (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerkrade
Ordained BishopSt. Crhistophe, Cathedral, Roermond, Diocese of Roermond

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roermond.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,173
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast