Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrikus Marie Gerardus Smeets

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1960 Born
13 Jun 199231.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
10 Oct 201857.9AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Dec 201858.1Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Hendrikus Marie Gerardus Smeets
Bishop Hendrikus Marie Gerardus Smeets (born ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeerlen, Diocese of Roermond
Ordained BishopCathedral, Roermond, Diocese of Roermond

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roermond.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2018
  • ob/bd: CB, 10 Oct 2018
  • c2+: CB, 18 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Dec 2018

Quantcast