Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus Maria Henricus Antonius Castermans

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

Titular Bishop of Skálholt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1924BornMaastricht
10 Mar 195126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
15 Jan 198257.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
15 Jan 198257.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Skálholt
13 Feb 198257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Skálholt
3 May 199773.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
21 Apr 200884.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Maria Henricus Antonius Castermans:
Bishop Alphonsus Maria Henricus Antonius Castermans (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013