Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Weskamm

Deceased

Bishop of Berlin, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1891Born
3 Apr 191422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
12 Oct 194958.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
12 Oct 194958.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhandus
30 Nov 194958.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhandus
29 May 195160.0AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
31 Jul 195160.2InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
21 Aug 195665.2DiedBishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Weskamm
Bishop Wilhelm Weskamm (born , died ) Bishop of Berlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelsen Waldeck

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast