Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Januária

Dioecesis Ianuariensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 15 June 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Montes Claros
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 38,187 (14,749 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste 2
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 96, Rua Gualberto de Almeida 216, 39480-000 Januaria, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (038)3621-1342
  • Fax: 3621-5182

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 June 1957ErectedDiocese of Montes Claros
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu
Diocese of Januária (erected)
5 July 2000Territory LostDiocese of Januária
Diocese of Montes Claros
Diocese of Janaúba (erected)
25 April 2001Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Januária (from Diamantina)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966229,511237,51196.6%4182210,43216911ap1967
1970299,267301,05099.4%191915,75019910ap1971
1976265,067292,91990.5%181814,72518811ap1977
1980303,000335,00090.4%181816,833191211ap1981
1990378,000408,00092.6%3182118,000181213ap1991
1999446,000471,00094.7%10152517,8403152216ap2000
2000240,000289,61082.9%3121516,000228229ap2001
2001213,000256,50083.0%4131712,5293241912ap2002
2002241,500256,50094.2%4121615,0932122112ap2003
2003260,000287,15090.5%6101616,2502102312ap2004
2004260,000287,15090.5%7121913,6842212714ap2005
2006266,000294,00090.5%8111914,0002152417ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 28 Jan 2012