Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Webster, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1924BornCastries
30 Jun 195733.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jun 196945.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada, Antilles
26 Jun 196945.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ottocium
31 Aug 196945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ottocium
7 Mar 197045.8AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada, Antilles
18 Nov 197450.5AppointedArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
10 May 197955.0ResignedArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
24 Jul 198965.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Patrick Webster:
Archbishop Patrick Webster O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Castries

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015