Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gordon Anthony Pantin, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1929Born
3 Jul 195525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Nov 196738.2AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
19 Mar 196838.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
12 Mar 200070.5DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Gordon Anthony Pantin
Archbishop Gordon Anthony Pantin C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 179, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast