Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Ganesh Singh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1927Born
7 Dec 195427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
16 Jan 197143.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
16 Jan 197143.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
18 Apr 197143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
12 Aug 197244.6AppointedBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
30 Oct 200375.9RetiredBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
12 Sep 201890.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Benedict Ganesh Singh
Bishop Benedict Ganesh Singh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Georgetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuxton, Diocese of Georgetown, Guyana
Death PlaceBalwant Singh, Hospital, Georgetown, Diocese of Georgetown, Guyana

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 13 Sep 2018

Quantcast