Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sydney Anicetus Charles

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1926Born
7 Mar 195427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
18 Nov 197448.5AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
26 Jan 197548.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
10 Jul 200276.2RetiredBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
4 Sep 201892.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Sydney Anicetus Charles
Bishop Sydney Anicetus Charles (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Grenada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Joseph, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago
Death PlaceSaint George’s, Diocese of Saint George’s in Grenada

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast