Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nassau

Archidioecesis Nassaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 June 1999
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bahamas
  • Region: Antilles (West Indies)
  • Square Kilometers: 13,872 (5,358 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofnassau.org/
  • Mailing Address: West St., P.O. Box N 8187, Nassau, Bahamas, W.I.
  • Telephone: (242)322-8919
  • Fax: 322-2599

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bahama
21 March 1929ErectedArchdiocese of New York Prefecture Apostolic of Bahama (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahama Islands
15 January 1941ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bahama Vicariate Apostolic of Bahama Islands
Diocese of Nassau
5 July 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bahama Islands Diocese of Nassau
10 June 1984Territory LostDiocese of Nassau Mission "Sui Iuris" of Turks and Caicos (erected)
Archdiocese of Nassau
22 June 1999ElevatedDiocese of Nassau Archdiocese of Nassau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahama Islands
195011,37875,00015.2%122234942233ap1951
Diocese of Nassau
196631,637138,00022.9%124052608208367ap1967
197032,920168,83819.5%123648685438160ap1971
198031,110238,97913.0%429339424335629ap1981
199045,102248,93318.1%1323361,2525274529ap1991
Archdiocese of Nassau
199946,922293,26116.0%1315281,6759153229ap2000
200047,626298,05016.0%1214261,83114153130ap2001
200147,688298,05016.0%1215271,76614153030ap2002
200247,688310,00015.4%1315281,70314152828ap2003
200341,077303,61113.5%1614301,36915142230ap2004
200448,168320,65515.0%1514291,66013142830ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012