Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Luluga

Bishop Emeritus of Nebbi, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1933 Born
1 Jun 196330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Arua, Uganda
17 Oct 198653.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gulu, Uganda
17 Oct 198653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
11 Jan 198753.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
8 Feb 199056.9AppointedBishop of Gulu, Uganda
2 Jan 199965.8AppointedBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
8 Feb 201177.9RetiredBishop of Nebbi, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Martin Luluga
Bishop Martin Luluga (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nebbi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodonga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nebbi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,250
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast