Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Griffiths

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1791BornSouthwark
1814²22.6Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
30 Jul 183342.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
30 Jul 183342.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
28 Oct 183342.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
11 Jul 183645.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
12 Aug 184756.2DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Griffiths:
Bishop Thomas Griffiths (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 290
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014