Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Lisowski

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1876Born
19 Aug 190023.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 192851.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
20 Jul 192851.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
7 Oct 192852.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
27 Jan 193356.3AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
25 May 193356.6InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
4 Jun 193962.6DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Lisowski
Bishop Franciszek Lisowski (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCieszanów

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast