Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstantin Stanich

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1757³BornMerzlopolye
15 Sep 178224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
18 Nov 181457.0SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
15 Mar 181557.3ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
10 Sep 181557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
31 Jul 183072.7DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstantin Stanich:
Bishop Konstantin Stanich (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013