Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabrijel Smičiklas (Smicsiklasz)

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1783³BornSošice
11 Jun 180825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
13 Mar 183450.9SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
23 Jun 183451.2ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
21 Sep 183451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
14 Mar 185672.9DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabrijel Smičiklas (Smicsiklasz) (VIAF: 305486335)
Bishop Gabrijel Smičiklas (Smicsiklasz) (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 167
  • op/ob: CB, 29 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016