Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykhaylo Bradács

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1748BornKamionka
2 Jul 177729.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
15 Aug 177729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
30 Sep 180860.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
30 Sep 180860.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
8 Jan 180960.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
20 Dec 181567.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mykhaylo Bradács
Bishop Mykhaylo Bradács (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 1
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 178
  • odd/opd/c01: CB, 9 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Jun 2016