Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Leo Ryan

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1930 BornMankato, MN
3 May 195625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Joliet in Illinois, USA
14 Aug 198150.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
14 Aug 198150.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Surista
30 Sep 198151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Surista
22 Nov 198353.2AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
18 Jan 198453.3InstalledBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
19 Oct 199969.1ResignedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Leo Ryan:
Bishop Daniel Leo Ryan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield in Illinois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014