Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Surian

Deceased

Bishop of Vence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1670BornSaint-Chamans
2 Apr 169524.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 172757.6SelectedBishop of Vence, France
24 Apr 172857.9ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
13 Jun 172858.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
3 Aug 175484.2DiedBishop of Vence, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Surian:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Surian (born , died ) Bishop of Vence

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013