Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie du Breuil de Pontbriand

Deceased

Bishop of Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1708³Born
1731¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 174032.9SelectedBishop of Québec, Canada
6 Mar 174133.1ConfirmedBishop of Québec, Canada
9 Apr 174133.2Ordained BishopBishop of Québec, Canada
8 Jun 176052.4DiedBishop of Québec, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie du Breuil de Pontbriand
Bishop Henri-Marie du Breuil de Pontbriand (born Jan 1708, died ) Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlacePleurtuit, France

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast