Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gerard Hanefeldt

Bishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1958 Born
14 Apr 198324.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
14 Jul 198426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
14 Jan 201556.7AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
19 Mar 201556.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gerard Hanefeldt
Bishop Joseph Gerard Hanefeldt (born ) Bishop of Grand Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCreighton
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Grand Island, Diocese of Grand Island, Nebraska

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Island.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 14 Jan 2015
  • mn: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 16 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 Aug 2018

Quantcast