Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Riccardo Carlesi

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1869BornPrato
8 Jul 191646.8AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
3 Sep 191647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
23 May 192353.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
9 Jan 193262.3DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Carlesi:
Bishop Riccardo Carlesi (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013