Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ezio Barbieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1887Born
16 Jul 191124.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 194558.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pisa, Italy
21 Jul 194558.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
26 Aug 194558.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
2 Aug 194962.5AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
3 Jun 197790.3RetiredBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
19 May 198295.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ezio Barbieri
Bishop Ezio Barbieri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButi

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast