Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco Giuseppe Bertelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1924BornPontedera
5 Apr 194723.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 198561.3AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
29 Jun 198561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
18 Mar 200076.2RetiredBishop of Volterra, Italy
2 Nov 201389.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vasco Giuseppe Bertelli:
Bishop Vasco Giuseppe Bertelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Volterra

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Nov 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014