Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Raimondo Verardo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1913Born
19 Jul 193623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1966²52.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Amalfi, Italy
8 Apr 196754.1AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
11 Jun 196754.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
7 Dec 198875.8RetiredBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
2 Mar 199986.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Raimondo Verardo (VIAF: 89045318)
Bishop Angelo Raimondo Verardo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova-Cornigliano, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceSanremo, Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Ventimiglia, Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • a215/loc: AM, 16 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast