Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Aliprandi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1924BornValleggia di Quiliano
22 May 194823.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 197146.9AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
24 Oct 197147.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
1 Feb 199974.3RetiredBishop of Cuneo, Italy
8 May 200378.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Aliprandi:
Bishop Carlo Aliprandi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013