Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacarías de Vizcarra y Arana

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Eressus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1880Born
31 Mar 190625.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 194766.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eressus
22 Jun 194766.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eressus
18 Sep 196382.8DiedTitular Bishop of Eressus

MicroData Summary for Zacarías de Vizcarra y Arana
Bishop Zacarías de Vizcarra y Arana (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Eressus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbadiano
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,947, Number 54
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast