Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelis Franciscus Maria van den Hout

Bishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1964 Born
7 Nov 199227.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
5 Jun 199328.5Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
1 Apr 201752.3AppointedBishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden, Netherlands
3 Jun 201752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Cornelis Franciscus Maria van den Hout (VIAF: 95437912)
Bishop Cornelis Franciscus Maria van den Hout (born ) Bishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTilburg
Ordained BishopSint Jozef, Cathedral, Groningen, Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Apr 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 2 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast