Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinand English

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1821¹Born
28 Sep 186039.7AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
11 Nov 186039.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
19 Sep 186241.7DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand English
Archbishop Ferdinand English (born 1821, died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClifton, Diocese of Clifton, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Clifton, Diocese of Clifton, England, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast