Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sosthène Ayikuli Udjuwa

Bishop of Mahagi-Nioka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1963 BornFaradje
15 Jul 199330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Nov 201047.4AppointedBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jan 201147.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Sosthène Ayikuli Udjuwa:
Bishop Sosthène Ayikuli Udjuwa (born ) Bishop of Mahagi-Nioka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mahagi-Nioka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013