Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pierre Elie XII Abbolyonan

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1840¹Born
1865¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 187434.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Chaldean), Turkey
28 Feb 187838.1SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
28 Feb 187939.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Jun 189454.4DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Elie XII Abbolyonan
Patriarch Pierre Elie XII Abbolyonan (born 1840, died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,343
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017