Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youhanan VIII Hormez

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1760¹BornAlqosh
1776¹16.0AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
22 May 177616.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
20 Apr 177818.3SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
5 Jul 183070.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Aug 183878.6DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youhanan VIII Hormez
Patriarch Youhanan VIII Hormez (born 1760, died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a bishop for 62.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,313
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 102
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016