Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Hindi

Deceased

Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean)


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1802AppointedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
8 Sep 1804Ordained BishopArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
6 Apr 1828DiedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Augustin Hindi:
Archbishop Augustin Hindi (died ) Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014