Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tharcisse Tshibangu Tshishiku

Bishop Emeritus of Mbujimayi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1933 BornKipushi
9 Aug 195926.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 197037.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 197037.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scampa
6 Dec 197037.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scampa
26 Nov 199158.6AppointedBishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Aug 200976.3RetiredBishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Tharcisse Tshibangu Tshishiku:
Bishop Tharcisse Tshibangu Tshishiku (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbujimayi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbujimayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013