Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Mambe Mukanga

Deceased

Bishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1929Born
28 Dec 195728.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 197949.9AppointedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jun 197950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Jan 200474.7DiedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Paul Mambe Mukanga
Bishop Paul Mambe Mukanga (born , died ) Bishop of Kindu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShopo

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast